This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 00:02:00 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS KYRSTAN HARADEN

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against KYRSTAN HARADEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3637

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Respondent

HARADEN KYRSTAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COE LOREN W

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/5/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Summons - Summons on Petition

11/12/2020: Summons - Summons on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/4/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

11/4/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/4/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 11/04/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/08/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/07/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Petitioner); As to: Kyrstan Haraden (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Petitioner); As to: Kyrstan Haraden (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03637    Hearing Date: June 7, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.’s Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of June 3, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of June 3, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”) against Respondent Krystan Haraden (“Respondent”) on November 4, 2020.

At the initial March 10 hearing, the Court continued the hearing because no proof of service was filed demonstrating Respondent was properly served with the Petition and Notice of Hearing. (3/10/21 Minute Order.) Petitioner was ordered to file a proof of service and warned that failure to do so could result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Id.)

To date, no proof of service was filed. Thus, the Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.’s Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STCP03637    Hearing Date: March 10, 2021    Dept: 25

CASE NAME: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Haraden PET. FILED: 11-04-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP03637

NOTICE: NO

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.’s Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO MAY 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file a proof of service demonstrating Respondent was properly served with this Petition. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 5, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 5, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”) against Respondent Krystan Haraden (“Respondent”) on November 4, 2020.

As an initial matter, the Court notes Petitioner did not file a proof of service demonstrating Respondent was properly served with the Petition and notice of hearing. Thus, the matter is CONTINUED. Petitioner is ordered to serve the Petition and notice of hearing as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 and to file a proof of service demonstrating it did so.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.’s Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO MAY 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file a proof of service demonstrating Respondent was properly served with this Petition. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COE LOREN W