This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA VS CHOOKHAE, CHAKRAPONG PAUL

Case Summary

On 08/14/2012 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHOOKHAE, CHAKRAPONG PAUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0771

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

CHOOKHAE CHAKRAPONG PAUL

CHOOKHAE ANGELA CAMPOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOINS, HALLIER R

Defendant Attorneys

CHOOKHAE, CHAKRAPONG PAUL

CHOOKHAE, ANGELA CAMPOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2014
  • LOST WRIT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY * LOST WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/30/12, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2012
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FOR DEMURRER WITHOUT APPEARANCE RULES OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • MOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 10/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SIGNED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less