This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2020 at 05:35:38 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS ANDRE DELAVICTORIA, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDRE DELAVICTORIA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3493

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

DELAVICTORIA AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERFAN HANNA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Delavictoria, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/09/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Delavictoria, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Delavictoria, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Delavictoria, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less