This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 08:41:21 (UTC).

WAYNE PROVISION CO., INC., A CORPORATION VS QUATTRO NAZO, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 WAYNE PROVISION CO , INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUATTRO NAZO, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9908

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE PROVISION CO. INC. A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants

MARDER AN INDIVIDUAL BRUCE AKA BRUCE A MARDER

QUATTRO NAZO LLC DBA BRENTWOOD RESTAURANT & LOUNGE AKA BRENTWOOD RESTAURANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SHERMAN GARY

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

7/28/2021: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

5/25/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court by Default

3/2/2021: Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court by Default

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3/3/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

2/19/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/19/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/19/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/7/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/7/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Filed By: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 40.00; Interest Credits: 7.84; Principal Credits: 1,808.16; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant); Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant), Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant) to Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant), Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/25/2021 ; Status Date changed from 03/02/2021 to 05/25/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant); Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Judgment by Court by Default: Filed By: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Judgment by Court by Default: Status Date changed from 02/19/2021 to 03/02/2021; Result Date changed from 03/02/2021 to 03/02/2021; As To Parties changed from Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant), Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant) to Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant), Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation DBA Premier Meat Company against Defendant Quattro Nazo, LLC AKA Brentwood Restaurant, DBA Brentwood Restaurant & Lounge and Defendant Bruce Marder, an individual AKA Bruce A Marder on the Complaint filed by Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation on 12/07/2020 for the principal amount of $752.91, attorney fees of $370.00, and costs of $685.25 for a total of $1,808.16.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 12/14/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant); Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant); Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wayne Provision Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quattro Nazo, LLC (Defendant); Bruce Marder, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAYNE PROVISION CO. INC. DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant