This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 05:00:01 (UTC).

WAYNE HOLLOWAY VS SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER/KIMBALL, TIREY & ST.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 WAYNE HOLLOWAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER/KIMBALL, TIREY ST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1968

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLLOWAY WAYNE

Defendants

SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER/KIMBALL TIREY & ST.

SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER

KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/10/2021

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/10/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/11/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/04/2021

1/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/04/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol], Standing Order 9/4/20

10/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol], Standing Order 9/4/20

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by WAYNE HOLLOWAY on 07/13/2020 as follows: Defendants SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER; Kimball, Tirey & St. John LLP do not owe the plaintiff WAYNE HOLLOWAY any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/10/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department M updated: Result Date to 02/10/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/10/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/04/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER (Defendant): Organization Name changed from SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER/KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. to SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: WAYNE HOLLOWAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol], Standing Order 9/4/20; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: WAYNE HOLLOWAY (Plaintiff); As to: SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER/KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/04/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP is a litigant