This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 11:41:28 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER VS 6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5148

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants

6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA PROSPECT

BRAIDY FREDDY AN INDIVIDUAL AKA BRAIDI FREDDY

BRAIDY FREDDY AKA BRAIDI FREDDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GARY S. SHERMAN, APC - MARLEE SHERMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY S. SHERMAN, APC

SHERMAN MARLEE

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

2/9/2018: Writ - Return

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2/26/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/27/2018 ; Status Date changed from 06/23/2017 to 02/27/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: (6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); FREDDY BRAIDY (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # CHA538853020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER) A CORPORATION DBA (PREMIER MEAT COMPANY) , RECEIPT NO. CHA538853021 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/23/17 . FOR (WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER) A CORPORATION DBA (PREMIER MEAT COMPANY) . AGAINST (6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA (PROSPECT) , (BRAIDY, FREDDY) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (BRAIDI, FREDDY) . PRINCIPAL $ 1025.96 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 151.00 . INTEREST $ 33.73 . COSTS $ 370.00 . TOTAL $ 1,580.69 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THORUGH 20 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA (PROSPECT) , (BRAIDY, FREDDY) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (BRAIDI, FREDDY) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO FREDDY BRAIDY SUB SERVED PM 042517 MAILED ON 042617 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO FREDDY BRAIDY SUB SERVED ON 042517 MAILEDO ON 042817 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/06/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA511599013. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC DBA GENESIS NIGHTCLUB DBA NOMAD KITCHEN is a litigant

Latest cases where WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF GARY S. SHERMAN, APC - MARLEE SHERMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERMAN MARLEE