This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 06:14:39 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION VS F2-LA, L.P., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against F2-LA, L P ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1671

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants

F2-LA INC. A CORPORATION

LEE AN INDIVIDUAL WOOGENE AKA WOOGENE G. LEE

F2-LA L.P. DBA FUNDAMENTAL DOWNTOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN GARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation on 09/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: F2-LA, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Woogene Lee, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: F2-LA, L.P. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: F2-LA, L.P. (Defendant); F2-LA, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Woogene Lee, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: F2-LA, L.P. (Defendant); F2-LA, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Woogene Lee, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: F2-LA, L.P. (Defendant); F2-LA, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Woogene Lee, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less