This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 13:36:56 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION VS BUNKER HILL RESTAURANT, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUNKER HILL RESTAURANT, INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0055

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants

BUNKER HILL RESTAURANT INC. A CORPORATION DBA THE BUNKER HILL RESTAURANT LA

KWAN AN INDIVIDUAL KA WAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN GARY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/11/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/11/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/7/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation on 09/11/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bunker Hill Restaurant, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Ka Wai Kwan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bunker Hill Restaurant, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Ka Wai Kwan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bunker Hill Restaurant, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Ka Wai Kwan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less