This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2020 at 07:23:16 (UTC).

WAYNE BENENFELD VS BRENT E. JONES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 WAYNE BENENFELD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRENT E JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2339

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENENFELD WAYNE

Defendants

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T CALIFORNIA

JONES BRENT E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/10/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/11/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketAddress for Laurence Feinberg (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by WAYNE BENENFELD on 03/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by WAYNE BENENFELD as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WAYNE BENENFELD (Plaintiff); As to: BRENT E. JONES (Defendant); PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WAYNE BENENFELD (Plaintiff); As to: BRENT E. JONES (Defendant); PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WAYNE BENENFELD (Plaintiff); As to: BRENT E. JONES (Defendant); PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY