This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2016 at 12:58:28 (UTC).

WATERSTONE WALNUT RIDGE VS. TERAOKA, DEANNA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2012 WATERSTONE WALNUT RIDGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TERAOKA, DEANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. LOPEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1631

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. LOPEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERSTONE WALNUT RIDGE

Defendants

TERAOKA DEANNA

HOPKINS ASHLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT

TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B.

Attorney at TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT12U01631 TO PAS12UJ1631

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED ON AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT(S) (TERAOKA, DEANNA) , (HOPKINS, ASHLEY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF RULING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. DANIEL S. LOPEZ PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 01/17/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK IS TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/18/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • *VOIDED DOCUMENT* WAIVER OF COURT FEES HAS BEEN DENIED. (HOPKINS, ASHLEY) FAILED TO PAY THE FEES OR REQUEST A HEARING WITHIN TEN DAYS AS ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO (HOPKINS, ASHLEY) ONLY IS VOID.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2012
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 11/13/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (TERAOKA, DEANNA) , (HOPKINS, ASHLEY) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (TERAOKA, DEANNA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (HOPKINS, ASHLEY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (TERAOKA, DEANNA) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 002 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (HOPKINS, ASHLEY) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 002 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMOTHY B. LIEGAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B.