This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 10:04:08 (UTC).

WASTE MANAGEMENT VS TRICOAST BUILDERS INC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 WASTE MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRICOAST BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0113

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WASTE MANAGEMENT

Defendants

TRICOAST BUILDERS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA T

TRICOAST BUILDERS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA TRICOAST BUILDERS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAN D WILNER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION - ALAN D. WILNER

Attorney at ALAN D WILNER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

WILNER ALAN D.

Defendant Attorney

CONNETTE MICHAEL THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - RE: ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CC1717.5(B)

4/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE: ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CC1717.5(B)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/2/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - RE: PLAINTIFF NOT SUBJECT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.50

4/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE: PLAINTIFF NOT SUBJECT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.50

Request for Dismissal

4/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

Other - (name extension) - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY

4/2/2018: Other - (name extension) - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY

Declaration (name extension) - RE: INTEREST CALCULATION

4/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE: INTEREST CALCULATION

Answer

4/9/2018: Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/15/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: (TRICOAST BUILDERS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to (TRICOAST BUILDERS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; On the Complaint filed by WASTE MANAGEMENT on 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CC1717.5(B); Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: PLAINTIFF NOT SUBJECT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.50; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: INTEREST CALCULATION; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketOther - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by WASTE MANAGEMENT on 05/26/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff); As to: (TRICOAST BUILDERS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (WASTE MANAGEMENT) (Plaintiff); As to: (TRICOAST BUILDERS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/30/2017; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 05/11/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853073. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tricoast Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant