This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2020 at 04:40:07 (UTC).

WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION VS TPORT SYSTEM, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TPORT SYSTEM, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7198

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALETICH CORPORATION A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Defendants

EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MURPHY WAREHOUSE COMPANY A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

TPORT SYSTEM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASSAKHIAN HARUTIUN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/26/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Hearing02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Cost: 123.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: TPORT SYSTEM, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); MURPHY WAREHOUSE COMPANY, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: TPORT SYSTEM, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WALETICH CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: TPORT SYSTEM, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASSAKHIAN HARUTIUN