This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 04:39:55 (UTC).

VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., DBA PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE VS ALEX ROMAN

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC , DBA PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEX ROMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7248

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES INC. DBA PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE

Defendant

ROMAN ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYNES NICHOLAS W

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/30/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/9/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

6/17/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/13/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE on 05/13/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: 03/20/2023; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEX ROMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEX ROMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEX ROMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VOCATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTES, INC., dba PIMA MEDICAL INSTITUTE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEX ROMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vocational Training Institute, Inc d/b/a PIMA Medical Institute is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynes, Nicholas W.