This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2020 at 02:16:38 (UTC).

VIVIANA SALTO MOLINA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ANGELA D. LULEJIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 VIVIANA SALTO MOLINA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANGELA D LULEJIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4241

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLINA AN INDIVIDUAL VIVIANA SALTO

Defendants

CABRERA AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN F.

LULEJIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELA D.

CABRERA AN INDIVIDUAL GAYANE L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAHOUDAI YOSI

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 11/02/2020

11/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 11/02/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/23/2020

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/16/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/16/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/18/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 11/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 11/02/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 09/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/02/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 09/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Yosi Yahoudai (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: VIVIANA SALTO MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VIVIANA SALTO MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA D. LULEJIAN, an Individual (Defendant); JOHN F. CABRERA, an Individual (Defendant); GAYANE L. CABRERA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VIVIANA SALTO MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA D. LULEJIAN, an Individual (Defendant); JOHN F. CABRERA, an Individual (Defendant); GAYANE L. CABRERA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: VIVIANA SALTO MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA D. LULEJIAN, an Individual (Defendant); JOHN F. CABRERA, an Individual (Defendant); GAYANE L. CABRERA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC04241    Hearing Date: November 02, 2020    Dept: 26

Molina v. Lulejian, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Yosi Yahoudai, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Viviana Salto Molina is DENIED FOR FAILURE TO GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING DATE.

Court clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 20STLC04241    Hearing Date: September 28, 2020    Dept: 26

Molina v. Lulejian, et al.TENTATIVE RULING

Yosi Yahoudai, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Viviana Salto Molina is CONTINUED TO NOVEMBER 2, 2020 AT 10 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. MOVING PARTY TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.