This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2020 at 14:58:08 (UTC).

VINCENT ROBERTO VS HAWAIIAN GARDENS CASINO

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 VINCENT ROBERTO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAWAIIAN GARDENS CASINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3931

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTO VINCENT

Defendant

HAWAIIAN GARDENS CASINO CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020

1/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/18/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

12/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

12/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/9/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (2nd) filed by Vincent Roberto on 12/09/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Hawaiian Gardens Casino Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 01/30/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Hawaiian Gardens Casino Corporation (Defendant) to Hawaiian Gardens Casino Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff); As to: Hawaiian Gardens Casino Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response; Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response; Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff); As to: Hawaiian Gardens Casino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff); As to: Hawaiian Gardens Casino Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vincent Roberto (Plaintiff); As to: Hawaiian Gardens Casino Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 12/09/2019 to 12/09/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWAIIAN GARDENS CASINO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant