This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2017 at 21:00:59 (UTC).

VILLASENOR, MARTHA VS. MACIAS, MARIA

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 VILLASENOR, MARTHA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MACIAS, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0855

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLASENOR MARTHA TRUSTEE

Defendant

MACIAS MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM APC - LANE NUSSBAUM

Attorney at NUSSBAUM APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/03/17 , FOR (VILLASENOR, MARTHA) TRUSTEE , AGAINST (MACIAS, MARIA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 6815 SEVILLE AVE. UNIT J HUNTINGTON PRK, CA 90255 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 22.50 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED VIA NUSSBAUM . RECEIPT # NOR625314021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MACIAS, MARIA) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . SERVICE FEE $45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (VILLASENOR, MARTHA) TRUSTEE FOR REJECTION OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL: CASE IS NOT AT ISSUE. NUSSBAUM SUBMITTED ON 03/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MACIAS, MARIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MACIAS, MARIA) . SERVICE FEE $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MACIAS, MARIA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR509405009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 05/01/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . JD .

    Read MoreRead Less