This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:35:56 (UTC).

VILLA VERSAILLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS ARTURO OCHOA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 VILLA VERSAILLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARTURO OCHOA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5999

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLA VERSAILLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

P. O. Box 668

La Mirada, CA 90637

Defendants

OCHOA ARTURO DBA WHITE VALLEY TREE SERVICE

Los Angeles, CA 90023

OCHOA MARCO

Pasadena, CA 91107

TULLOS YADIRA

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

2/11/2019: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/11/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/11/2019

2/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/11/2019

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/18/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

1/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Villa Versailles Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Villa Versailles Homeowners Association on 11/26/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Villa Versailles Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Marco Ochoa (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/14/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Villa Versailles Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Ochoa (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice Small Claims Reassignment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Villa Versailles Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/11/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Villa Versailles Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Ochoa (Defendant); Marco Ochoa (Defendant); Yadira Tullos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less