This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2020 at 01:35:35 (UTC).

VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC VS VANESSA DAVIS

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANESSA DAVIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8613

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC

Defendant

DAVIS VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/25/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • Hearing10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/27/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC is a litigant