This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 12:23:40 (UTC).

VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC VS MEGAN FERNANDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEGAN FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8902

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC

Defendants

FERNANDEZ MEGAN

FERNANDEZ YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/25/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/3/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Megan Fernandez (Defendant); Yolanda Fernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Video Symphony, LLC on 07/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Video Symphony, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Megan Fernandez (Defendant); Yolanda Fernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Megan Fernandez (Defendant); Yolanda Fernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Megan Fernandez (Defendant); Yolanda Fernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC is a litigant