This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2020 at 01:09:11 (UTC).

VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC VS LAUREN SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAUREN SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8888

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC

Defendant

SMITH LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

GABRA NOHA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/25/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/11/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

2/10/2020: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

2/7/2020: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); Lauren Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Video Symphony, LLC on 07/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Video Symphony, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/30/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Lauren Smith (Defendant); As to: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABRA NOHA