This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2020 at 00:47:08 (UTC).

VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC VS AURELIO CONTRERAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 VIDEO SYMPHONY, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AURELIO CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9453

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC

Defendants

CONTRERAS AURELIO

CONTRERAS AURELIO SR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/2/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/30/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/30/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurelio Contreras (Defendant); Aurelio Contreras, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Video Symphony, LLC on 07/30/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Video Symphony, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurelio Contreras (Defendant); Aurelio Contreras, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurelio Contreras (Defendant); Aurelio Contreras, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Video Symphony, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurelio Contreras (Defendant); Aurelio Contreras, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC is a litigant