This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 20:18:54 (UTC).

VICTORINO CASTILLO VS GLORIA'S COUNTRY BUTCHER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 VICTORINO CASTILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GLORIA'S COUNTRY BUTCHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5144

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO VICTORINO

Los Angeles, CA 90020

Defendants

GLORIA'S COUNTRY BUTCHER

CHANDLER JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MALHOTRA KRISHNA RAJENDRA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/30/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/26/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/26/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/26/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

4/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Motion to Compel

5/14/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Motion to Compel

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

6/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

6/10/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Complaint

4/4/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

4/4/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/4/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/4/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Victorino Castillo on 04/04/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 10/02/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted: Filed By: Gloria's Country Butcher (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Gloria's Country Butcher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 09/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 09/10/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 09/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: Gloria's Country Butcher (Defendant); As to: Gloria's Country Butcher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gloria's Country Butcher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Victorino Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: Gloria's Country Butcher (Defendant); James Chandler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Victorino Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Victorino Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Victorino Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC05144    Hearing Date: February 20, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

(CCP § 2030.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Jose Manzo’s Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories is CONTINUED TO MARCH 9, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On May 29, 2019, Plaintiff Jose Manzo (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for damages for violations of the Unruh Civil Rights Act against Defendant Thomas Anderson (“Defendant”). On September 4, 2019, Defendant filed an Answer.

On November 12, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Compel Defendant’s Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions and Motion to Compel Defendant’s Answers to Inspection Demands and Request for Sanctions. On January 30, 2020, at the hearing for these motions, Defendant argued that the discovery requests should be directed at his trust, not at him individually. The Court continued the hearing on the discovery motions and set an Order to Show Cause to verify the status of the trust for Defendant and to verify the status of Defendant as the proper litigant being sued for March 2, 2020. (1/30/20 Minute Order.)

On December 5, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Defendant’s Further Answers to Interrogatories (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition or reply briefs have been filed.

In light of the order to show cause scheduled for March 2, 2020, the hearing on the instant Motion is continued to allow for the determination of the proper defendant in this action.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Jose Manzo’s Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories is CONTINUED TO MARCH 9, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALHOTRA KRISHNA RAJENDRA