This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 04:53:38 (UTC).

VICTORIA GRAY VS KIA CERRITOS SERVICE CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 VICTORIA GRAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIA CERRITOS SERVICE CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2525

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY VICTORIA

Defendants

KIA CERRITOS SERVICE CENTER

WESTON HERBIE

SOBH LOU

LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC C2463470

Not Classified By Court

BUREAU OF AUTOMOTIVE REPAIRS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

6/22/2021: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

3/18/2021: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/18/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

3/18/2021: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/18/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/18/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/18/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/18/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/18/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/10/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

1/11/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (C2463470) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff VICTORIA GRAY against Defendant Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (C2463470) on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (2nd) filed by VICTORIA GRAY on 10/26/2020 for the principal amount of $750.00 and costs of $200.00 for a total of $950.00.; Other: Upon full payment of this judgment, the defendants shall owe no further warranty or other obligation to Ms. Gray.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant Lou Sobh and Defendant Herbie Weston against Plaintiff VICTORIA GRAY on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (2nd) filed by VICTORIA GRAY on 10/26/2020 for a total of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOther - Exhibits Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/18/2021; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/18/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/08/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued and Filed by: Clerk; As to: VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff) to VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection (SASE): Name Extension: (SASE); As To Parties changed from VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff) to VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection (SASE) w/ already stamped subpoena: Name Extension changed from (SASE) to (SASE) w/ already stamped subpoena; As To Parties changed from VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff) to VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: VICTORIA GRAY (Plaintiff); As to: KIA CERRITOS SERVICE CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAU OF AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR is a litigant

Latest cases where LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA KIA OF CERRITOS is a litigant