Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2018 at 08:47:22 (UTC).

VICTOR M. NAVA, ET AL. VS ALMA B OROZCO

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 VICTOR M NAVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALMA B OROZCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2217

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAVA VICTOR M.

Pasadena, CA 91103

NAVA E

NAVA EVELYN

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant

OROZCO ALMA B

Palmdale, CA 93550

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

3/26/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

3/26/2018: Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/18/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/18/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/23/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - As to Plaintiff's Claim only.

4/3/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - As to Plaintiff's Claim only.

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

11/17/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/17/2018 ; Status Date changed from 01/18/2018 to 04/17/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Updated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment As to Plaintiff's Claim only.: Name Extension: As to Plaintiff's Claim only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/17/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/17/2018 to 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Victor M. Nava (Plaintiff); As to: Alma B Orozco (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Alma B Orozco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Address for Alma B Orozco (Defendant) customer request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/18/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Evelyn Nava and Plaintiff Victor M. Nava against Defendant Alma B Orozco on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Victor M. Nava, et al. on 10/24/2017 for the principal amount of $2,800.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,890.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Defendant Alma B Orozco against Plaintiff Evelyn Nava and Plaintiff Victor M. Nava on the Defendant's Claim filed by Alma B Orozco on 11/17/2017 for the principal amount of $470.00 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $625.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Updated -- Nava, Evelyn: First Name changed from E to Evelyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alma B Orozco (Defendant); As to: Evelyn Nava (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/27/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alma B Orozco (Defendant); As to: Victor M. Nava (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/27/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Alma B Orozco (Defendant); As to: E Nava (Plaintiff); Victor M. Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Victor M. Nava (Plaintiff); E Nava (Plaintiff); As to: Alma B Orozco (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/31/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Victor M. Nava (Plaintiff); E Nava (Plaintiff); As to: Alma B Orozco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less