This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 10:31:33 (UTC).

VICTOR ANTONIO FUENTES VS 605 AUTO INC.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 VICTOR ANTONIO FUENTES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 605 AUTO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5406

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUENTES VICTOR ANTONIO

Defendants

605 AUTO INC.

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC DBA 605 AUTO INC.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/23/2019: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/23/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/24/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/24/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/24/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/25/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/22/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff VICTOR ANTONIO FUENTES against Defendant Freeway Auto Group, Inc DBA 605 Auto Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by VICTOR ANTONIO FUENTES on 10/22/2019 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $1,050.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Freeway Auto Group, Inc (Defendant): Organization Name changed from 605 AUTO INC. to Freeway Auto Group, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/24/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 605 AUTO INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/23/2019; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: VICTOR ANTONIO FUENTES (Plaintiff); As to: 605 AUTO INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: VICTOR ANTONIO FUENTES (Plaintiff); As to: 605 AUTO INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC. is a litigant