Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 00:44:09 (UTC).

VICENTE RIOS VS CARLOS PULIDO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by VICENTE RIOS against CARLOS PULIDO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2918

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIOS VICENTE

Defendants

PULIDO CARLOS

PULIDO SILVIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/15/2018

11/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/15/2018

Other - (name extension) - Other - Court's Statement of Decision

11/29/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - Court's Statement of Decision

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/29/2018

11/29/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/29/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/29/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/29/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/10/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Vicente Rios on 09/10/2018 as follows: Defendants Carlos Pulido; Silvia Pulido do not owe the plaintiff Vicente Rios any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: See attached Statement of Decision.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Other - Court's Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/29/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 11/15/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/15/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vicente Rios (Plaintiff); As to: Silvia Pulido (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vicente Rios (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Pulido (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vicente Rios (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Pulido (Defendant); Silvia Pulido (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Vicente Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Vicente Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less