This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 19:00:26 (UTC).

VEROS CREDIT LLC VS ISLANDER AUTO REPAIR

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 VEROS CREDIT LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ISLANDER AUTO REPAIR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5562

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEROS CREDIT LLC

Defendant

ISLANDER AUTO REPAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TENNANT ROBERT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

12/19/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

12/19/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

8/14/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/29/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

1/29/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/21/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Veros Credit Llc on 12/19/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Veros Credit Llc as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Veros Credit Llc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 06/18/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Robert Michael Tennant (Attorney); As to: Veros Credit Llc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Islander Auto Repair (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Islander Auto Repair (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Denied; Result Date: 01/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Islander Auto Repair (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Veros Credit Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Islander Auto Repair (Defendant); Service Date: 01/03/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Veros Credit Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Islander Auto Repair (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Veros Credit Llc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

ST N R W

. Fax {949} 756-9060

MADISON LAW, APC

17702 Mitchell North, irvine, CA 82614

Tel {949) 756-9050 . .

A T AR

::_E‘

AtigRarvaneh, SBN 218320 aparvaneh@madisonlawapc.com James S. Sifers, SBN 259105

jsifers@ madisonlawapc.com FILEfi I

Erin N. Collins, SBN 291726 caperior Court of Catiforni? ecollins@ madisonlawapc.com gupr*n‘!“t‘v of Los Angzies MADISON LAW, APC . < 22017

17702 Mitchell North DEC 192

Irvine, California 92614 o xecu‘uve wincer/Clerks Telephone: 949-756-9050 Sherpanss , Deputy Facsimile: 949-756-9060 BY Siana Salazar

Attorneys for Plaintiff Veros Credit, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES —~ STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited liability (Case No.: 173TLCO5562 Ay ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES to: Hon. Plaintiff. e V. COMPLAINT FOR:

ISL.AND]:R.AUTO R,EP“AIR,' an unknown 1. BREACH OF STATUTORY DUTY business entity; and DOES 1 through 10, 2. CONVERSION inclusive, 3. VIOLATION OF CAL. BUS. & PROF. CODE § 17200, ET SEQ. 4. CLAIM AND DELIVERY

[JURY TRIAL DEMANDED]

[LIMITED JURISDICTION UNDER $10,000]

Defendants.

BY FAX

COMES NOW Plaintiff Veros Credit, LLC (“Plaintiff”) in its Complaint against Defendant

Islander Auto Repair (“Defendant™) and Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and alleges as follows:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Tennant