This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 08:46:33 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, VS GUTIERREZ, ANGEL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2013 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUTIERREZ, ANGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6155

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

GUTIERREZ ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S DESAI

DESAI VIJAY S

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Bryant Burnstad in Support of Proposed Court Order to Substitute in as Attorney of Record

11/3/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Bryant Burnstad in Support of Proposed Court Order to Substitute in as Attorney of Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Bryant Burnstad in Support of Proposed Court Order to Substitute in as Attorney of Record; Filed by: (VELOCITY INVESTMENTS,) LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/25/14 . FOR (VELOCITY INVESTMENTS,)LLC . AGAINST (GUTIERREZ, ANGEL) . PRINCIPAL $ 5035.50 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 392.13 . INTEREST $ 1505.58 . COSTS $ 276.92 . TOTAL $ 7,210.13 . /SG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (GUTIERREZ, ANGEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ANGEL GUTIERREZ . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUTIERREZ, ANGEL) BY SUBSERVING ALEX GUTIERREZ, CO-OCCUPANT, ON 11/29/13 . COSTS OF $ 51.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 11/08/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 11/08/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965014. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S. DESAI ESQ