This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 06:27:27 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, JORGE VS VINALAY, JIMMY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 VASQUEZ, JORGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VINALAY, JIMMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6235

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ JORGE

Defendants

VINALAY JIMMY

VINALAY EDUARDO

VINALAY JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASQUEZ, JORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DECLARATIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • OSC SET 12/05/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less