This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 19:58:36 (UTC).

VANESSA GRASER VS BLAZIN WINGS INC

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 VANESSA GRASER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLAZIN WINGS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5935

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRASER VANESSA

Defendant

BLAZIN WINGS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARILA KRISTINE S

Defendant Attorney

JAMES STACEY EILEEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/12/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

12/12/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

12/12/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Request for Dismissal

6/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Answer

2/15/2018: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/7/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Vanessa Graser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Blazin Wings Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Vanessa Graser (Plaintiff); As to: Blazin Wings Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vanessa Graser (Plaintiff); As to: Blazin Wings Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vanessa Graser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

£ @y 5 B2

UEC 122017

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIEQF “%a . Execuhve Officer/Clerk

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAT" Dmnasma ar |

' JUDICIAL DISTRICT/STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

VANESSA GRASER, an individual,

Caselo 17STLCCSG R

Plaintiff,

V. COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

BLAZIN WINGS, INC., a Minnesota corporation and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Violation of Meal/Rest Periods;

Unpaid Overtime;

Late Payment of Final Paycheck (Waiting time penalties);

Violation of Labor Code re: Payroll records;

Violation of Labor Code re: Personnel File

Unfair Business Practices

Defendants.

Claim for over $10,000 up to $25,000 Demand for Jury Trial

Narta’

Plaintiff, Vanessa Graser alleges as follows: 1. Plaintiff, Vanessa Graser is an individual residing in the County of Los Angeles,

State of California.

1 Complaint for Damages — Employment Law

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blazin Wings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES STACEY E.