This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 08:07:50 (UTC).

VAN ETTEN SIPPRELLE LLP, VS JOHN M. MILLER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 VAN ETTEN SIPPRELLE LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN M MILLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3302

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAN ETTEN SIPPRELLE LLP

Defendants

CITY LIGHTS FINANCIAL EXPRESS INC.

MILLER JOHN M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPPRELLE KEITH ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

CARLSON ROBERT JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

1/30/2020: Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

3/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/3/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/30/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Judgment - Judgment in Favor of Van Etten Sipprelle LLP

7/20/2020: Judgment - Judgment in Favor of Van Etten Sipprelle LLP

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/21/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/21/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/21/2018: Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/12/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/12/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/20/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/20/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/21/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff); As to: John M. Miller (Defendant); City Lights Financial Express, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment in Favor of Van Etten Sipprelle LLP: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, a California limited liability partnership against Defendant John M. Miller and Defendant City Lights Financial Express, INC., a California corporation on the Complaint filed by Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, on 02/21/2018 for the principal amount of $4,909.00, attorney fees of $990.00, and costs of $61.65 for a total of $5,960.65, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketJudgment in Favor of Van Etten Sipprelle LLP; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff); As to: John M. Miller (Defendant); City Lights Financial Express, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re lodging of Proposed Judgment scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff); As to: John M. Miller (Defendant); City Lights Financial Express, INC., (Defendant); Total Costs: 1051.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Appearance Case Review re lodging of Proposed Judgment scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/04/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re lodging of Proposed Judgment scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to City Lights Financial Express, INC.,; On the Complaint filed by Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, on 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff); As to: John M. Miller (Defendant); Service Date: 05/07/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff); As to: John M. Miller (Defendant); Service Date: 05/07/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff); As to: John M. Miller (Defendant); City Lights Financial Express, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Van Etten Sipprelle LLP, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC03302    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 26

Van Etten Sipprelle, LLP v. Miller, et al.

ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

(CCP § 664.6)

TENTATIVE RULING:

PLAINTIFF VAN ETTEN SIPPRELLE, LLP’S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS JOHN M. MILLER AND CITY LIGHTS FINANCIAL EXPRESS, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,909.00 PRINCIPAL, $61.65 COSTS, AND $990.00 REASONABLE ATTORNEY’S FEES.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Van Etten Sipprelle, LLP (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of retainer agreement against Defendants John M. Miller and City Lights Financial Express, Inc. (“Defendants”) on February 21, 2018. On August 21, 2019, Plaintiff filed a notice of conditional settlement.

Plaintiff now moves to enforce the settlement and enter judgment against Defendants. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Legal Standard

Under Code of Civil Procedure, section 664.6:

If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 664.6.) Strict compliance with the statutory requirements is necessary before a court can enforce a settlement agreement under this statute. (Sully-Miller Contracting Co. v. Gledson/Cashman Construction, Inc. (2002) 103 Cal.App.4th 30, 37.) Accordingly, “parties” under section 664.6 means the litigants themselves, not their attorneys. (Levy v. Superior Court (1995) 10 Cal.4th 578, 586 (holding “we conclude that the term ‘parties’ as used in section 664.6 means the litigants themselves, and does not include their attorneys of record.”).) Additionally, the settlement must include the signatures of the parties seeking to enforce the agreement, and against whom enforcement is sought. (J.B.B. Investment Partners, Ltd. v. Fair (2014) 232 Cal.App.4th 974, 985.)

Discussion

Plaintiff has demonstrated compliance with the statutory requirements set forth above. (Motion, Sipprelle Decl., ¶5 and Exh. B.) The settlement provides that Defendants will pay the sum of $5,909.00 in two separate installments to be completed within 30 days of execution on August 20, 2019. (Id. at Exh. B, ¶1.) The settlement agreement also provides that upon Defendants’ default, Plaintiff may move for entry of judgment in the stipulated amount, plus attorneys’ fees and costs to enforce the settlement, but less payments made. (Id. at Exh. B, ¶¶4, 12.) Payment of $1,000.00 was made towards the stipulated judgment, after which Defendants defaulted. (Id. at ¶6.) Plaintiff provided Defendant with written notice of the default and an opportunity to cure, but the default has not been remedied. (Ibid.)

In light of Defendants’ violation of the stipulated settlement terms, Plaintiff’s Motion to Enforce Settlement is GRANTED. Plaintiff is entitled to entry of judgment in the amount of $4,909.00 principal, $61.65 costs, and $990.00 reasonable attorney’s fees based on two hours of attorney time. (Id. at ¶¶7-14.)

Moving party to give notice.

Parties may submit via e mail until Monday at 10 a.m.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VAN ETTEN SIPPRELLE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY LIGHTS FINANCIAL EXPRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPPRELLE, KEITH A