This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2021 at 04:12:59 (UTC).

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES, LLC VS PERLA YESENIA MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERLA YESENIA MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5983

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

MORALES PERLA YESENIA

SANCHEZ FELIX LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

9/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/14/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/19/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/12/2021

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/12/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Valley Active Properties, LLC on 09/14/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 01/12/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/12/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Perla Yesenia Morales (Defendant); Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Felix Lopez Sanchez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/10/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Perla Yesenia Morales (Defendant); Felix Lopez Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant