This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 06:51:44 (UTC).

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES, LLC VS BRIAN ANDREW MARSHALL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRIAN ANDREW MARSHALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0275

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

MARSHALL BRIAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/22/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2020

3/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Valley Active Properties, LLC on 01/22/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 03/04/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Andrew Marshall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant