This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 20:40:48 (UTC).

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES, LLC VS BRIAN A. MARSHALL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRIAN A MARSHALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3791

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

MARSHALL BRIAN A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAVIS GLEN M.

 

Court Documents

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession of Real property

1/15/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession of Real property

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/14/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/10/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/9/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/24/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Brian A. Marshall)

12/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Brian A. Marshall)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/16/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/16/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession of Real property; Issued by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian A. Marshall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 62.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian A. Marshall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Brian A. Marshall; On the Complaint filed by Valley Active Properties, LLC on 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Valley Active Properties, LLC against Defendant Brian A. Marshall on the Complaint filed by Valley Active Properties, LLC on 12/16/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 23 W. Glenarm St., Pasadena, CA 91104 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian A. Marshall (Defendant); Service Date: 12/16/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian A. Marshall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian A. Marshall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Valley Active Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian A. Marshall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAVIS, GLEN M.