This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2017 at 11:01:48 (UTC).

VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV,LLC VS. BEYOND ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV,LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BEYOND ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5531

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ARIDJIAN ARTHUR AND INDIVIDUAL

DAVTYAN MARINA AN INDIVIDUAL

BEYOND ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS PITA PI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD L. SEIDER, APC - RICHARD L. SEIDE ESQ

Attorney at RICHARD L. SEIDER, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/30/16 , FOR (VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV,LLC) A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY , AGAINST (BEYOND ENTERPRISES INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION , DOING BUSINESS AS PITA PIT , (DAVTYAN, MARINA) AN INDIVIDUAL , (ARIDJIAN, ARTHUR) AND INDIVIDUAL , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 28253 NEWHALL RANCH ROAD UNIT #2-M VALENCIA, CA 91355 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ATTY SVC- JANNEY . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (BEYOND ENTERPRISES INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION , DOING BUSINESS AS PITA PIT , (ARIDJIAN, ARTHUR) AND INDIVIDUAL , ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BEYOND ENTERPRISES INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION , DOING BUSINESS AS PITA PIT , (ARIDJIAN, ARTHUR) AND INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 143.69 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (DAVTYAN, MARINA) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (DAVTYAN, MARINA) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ARIDJIAN, ARTHUR) AND INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: OF NON-SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS COMPLIANT PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: OF NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DAVTYAN, MARINA) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS623737007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/07/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seide, Richard L