This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 00:49:09 (UTC).

VAHAG SHABANI VS CHERYL ANNE TEETER-BALIN

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 VAHAG SHABANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHERYL ANNE TEETER-BALIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2858

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHABANI VAHAG

Defendant

TEETER-BALIN CHERYL ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRUN ARSINE

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ WALTER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

5/8/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice (name extension) - Notice THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PRE

1/12/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PRE

Notice (name extension) - Notice THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

1/12/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMO

12/15/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMO

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

12/15/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

12/15/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Vahag Shabani on 03/27/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Vahag Shabani as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/27/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice THAT DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant); As to: Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice THAT DEFENDANT?S MOTIONS FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES HAVE BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant); As to: Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WALTER RODRIGUEZ: As To Parties changed from Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff) to Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff); As to: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff); As to: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vahag Shabani (Plaintiff); As to: Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC02858    Hearing Date: January 14, 2021    Dept: 26

Shabani v. Teeter-Balin, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Vahag Shabani to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Vahag Shabani to Respond to Request for Production, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $718.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (“Defendant”) propounded Special Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production, on Plaintiff Vahag Shabani (“Plaintiff”) on June 12, 2020. (Motions, Rodriguez Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, Defendant twice extended the deadline to serve verified responses. (Id. at Exhs. B-C.) Following no response from Plaintiff after the last deadline, Defendant filed the instant Motions to Compel Responses and Request for Sanctions on December 15, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Based on the Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the propounded discovery, Defendant is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to serve verified responses to the special interrogatories and request for production without objections.

Plaintiff’s failure to timely respond constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030 and have been properly noticed for each motion. Therefore, the request for sanctions is granted against Plaintiff and counsel of record in the total amount of $718.00 based on four hours of attorney time billed at $143.75 an hour and $143.00 in costs. (Motions, Rodriguez Decl., ¶6.)

Conclusion

Defendant Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Vahag Shabani to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Vahag Shabani to Respond to Request for Production, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $718.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 20STLC02858    Hearing Date: January 13, 2021    Dept: 26

Shabani v. Teeter-Balin, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES;

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin’s Motion Compelling Plaintiff Vahag Shabani to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $226.75 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin (“Defendant”) propounded Form Interrogatories, Set One, on Plaintiff Vahag Shabani (“Plaintiff”) on June 12, 2020. (Motion, Rodriguez Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, Defendant twice extended the deadline to serve verified responses. (Id. at Exhs. B-C.) Upon no response from Plaintiff after the last deadline, Defendant filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions on December 15, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Based on the Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the propounded discovery, Defendant is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to serve verified responses to the form interrogatories without objections.

Plaintiff’s failure to timely respond constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030 and have been properly noticed. Therefore, the request for sanctions is granted against Plaintiff and counsel of record in the amount of $226.75 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $143.75 an hour and $83.00 in costs. (Motion, Rodriguez Decl., ¶6.)

Conclusion

Defendant Cheryl Anne Teeter-Balin’s Motion Compelling Plaintiff Vahag Shabani to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. Plaintiff is to serve verified responses without objections within 20 days’ service of this order. Plaintiff and counsel of record are jointly and severally ordered to pay sanctions of $226.75 to defense counsel within 20 days’ service of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ WALTER