This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 20:31:58 (UTC).

USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. VS HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 USA EXPRESS LEGAL INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2619

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC.

Defendants

LOHRASBI HARRY HAMID

LORASBI MINA G.

ESHRAGHI KHASHAYAR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/8/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/29/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

11/23/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

11/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/5/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

10/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. on 10/05/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant); MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. on 10/05/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. as to HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI and MINA G. LORASBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff); As to: KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/14/20; Service Cost: 63.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/08/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/08/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant), KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI (Defendant), MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant) to HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant), KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI (Defendant), MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI (Defendant), MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant), HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant) to MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant), HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant), KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY HAMID LOHRASBI (Defendant); MINA G. LORASBI (Defendant); KHASHAYAR ESHRAGHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 12/09/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA EXPRESS LEGAL INVESTIGATIVE SERVICE INC is a litigant