This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 00:04:29 (UTC).

U.S. FOODS VS COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALON, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 U S FOODS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALON, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0146

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. FOODS FKA U.S. FOODSERVICE INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALON INC. DBA COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALON

BAKER JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARWACKI RAYMOND DANIEL JR

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3/4/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/5/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

2/22/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/9/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/18/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - re: accrued interest

4/27/2018: Declaration (name extension) - re: accrued interest

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - 1033

4/27/2018: Declaration (name extension) - 1033

Declaration (name extension) - re: lost agreement/contract

4/27/2018: Declaration (name extension) - re: lost agreement/contract

Judgment

4/27/2018: Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/27/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/28/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

10/23/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/23/2017: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cowboy Joe's Sports Salon, Inc. (Defendant); Joe Baker (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 103.39; Credits: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: U.S. Foods (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10 inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: U.S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: U.S. Foods (Plaintiff); As to: Cowboy Joe's Sports Salon, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/31/2017; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. Foods (Plaintiff); As to: Joe Baker (Defendant); Service Date: 11/06/2017; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. Foods (Plaintiff); As to: Cowboy Joe's Sports Salon, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where US Foodservice Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARWACKI JR. RAYMOND DANIEL