Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2021 at 13:46:14 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS JONATHAN S JAMES

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONATHAN S JAMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6338

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

JAMES JONATHAN S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/18/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/9/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION on 11/09/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN S JAMES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN S JAMES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN S JAMES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUN ERIC