Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:00:39 (UTC).

URT KEYSTONE TOWING, INC. VS SCOTT VINCENT BALKAM

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by URT KEYSTONE TOWING, INC against SCOTT VINCENT BALKAM in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4596

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URT KEYSTONE TOWING INC. DBA KEYSTONE TOWING

Defendant

BALKAM SCOTT VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/7/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/24/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/7/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff URT Keystone Towing, Inc. DBA Keystone Towing against Defendant SCOTT VINCENT BALKAM on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by URT Keystone Towing, Inc. on 09/10/2018 for the principal amount of $1,677.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $1,802.00.; Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to Judgment Debtor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 11/07/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: URT Keystone Towing, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SCOTT VINCENT BALKAM (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: URT Keystone Towing, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SCOTT VINCENT BALKAM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less