This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 06:15:06 (UTC).

URBAN FAB CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MOON UP IN THE SKY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 URBAN FAB CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOON UP IN THE SKY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0014

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URBAN FAB CORP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MOON UP IN THE SKY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MIRACLE BERRY

KIM KYUNG SUN

MOON BRIAN

GENESIS APPAREL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NESBITT PAUL BELVEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dis...)

3/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dis...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dis...) of 03/04/2019

3/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dis...) of 03/04/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019

1/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Summons - /1st Amended Complaint

8/18/2017: Summons - /1st Amended Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

8/1/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint - (Amended)

8/18/2017: Complaint - (Amended)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/1/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Urban Fab Corp, a California Corporation on 08/01/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dis...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dis...) of 03/04/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dismissal scheduled for 03/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 03/04/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dismissal scheduled for 03/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/29/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by: Urban Fab Corp, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Moon Up In The Sky Inc, a California corporation (Defendant); Brian Moon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSummons /1st Amended Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Urban Fab Corp, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Moon Up In The Sky Inc, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Urban Fab Corp, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Complaint: Status Date changed from 08/18/2017 to 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOON UP IN THE SKY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN FAB CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NESBITT PAUL B