This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 10:05:09 (UTC).

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS CBC FRAMING INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CBC FRAMING INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2883

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

CBC FRAMING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPERLING DEAN P

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation on 12/28/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CBC FRAMING INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/29/2020; Service Cost: 176.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CBC FRAMING INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CBC FRAMING INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CBC FRAMING INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CBC FRAMING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED SPECIALTY INS. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sperling, Dean P.