Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 15:02:03 (UTC).

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY VS WALSH-SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALSH-SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4379

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

WALSH-SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS

CONSTRUCTORS WALSH-SHEA CORRIDOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NIVINSKUS LAW GROUP, A LAW CORP

NIVINSKUS LAW GROUP A LAW CORP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/06/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 04/08/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER PERSONAL INJURY Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSTRUCTORS WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS A BUSINESS OF FORM UNKNOWN; is a litigant

Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant