Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 19:10:42 (UTC).

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY VS KARLA TORRES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARLA TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6814

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TORRES KARLA

LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC DBA KIA OF CERRITOS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC DBA KIA OF CERRITOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ROEB CRAIG ALAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/21/2021

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

1/21/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

2/14/2020: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

2/14/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment

2/14/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer - Answer

8/23/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/23/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

8/23/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/22/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/22/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 04/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc on 08/23/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Karla Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/21/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/27/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (Defendant); As to: Karla Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/05/2019; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Torres (Defendant); Service Date: 08/02/2019; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Torres (Defendant); Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Torres (Defendant); Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Torres (Defendant); Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06814    Hearing Date: July 27, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., July 27, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: United Financial Casualty Company v. Torres, et al.

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC06814 COMP. FILED: 07-22-19

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 12-22-20

MOTION C/O: 01-06-21

TRIAL DATE: 01-21-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Defendant/Cross-Complainant Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. dba Kia of Cerritos

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

(CCP § 437c)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant/Cross-Complainant Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. dba Kia of Cerritos’s Motion for Summary Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 75/80 Day Lapse (CCP 12c and 1005 (b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 24, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 24, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On July 22, 2019, Plaintiff United Financial Casualty Company (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for subrogation and indebtedness against Defendants Karla Torres (“Torres”) and Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. dba Kia of Cerritos (“Kia”).

On August 23, 2019, Defendant Kia filed an Answer and a Cross-Complaint against Defendant Torres for indemnity, contribution, apportionment, and declaratory relief. Following Defendant Torres’ failure to respond to the Complaint, default was entered against her on September 19, 2019.

On February 14, 2020, Defendant Kia filed the instant Motion for Summary Judgment (the “Motion”) arguing that there are no triable issues of material fact regarding Plaintiff’s claims against Defendant Kia. (Mot., p. 2:9-12.) No opposition was filed.

On March 10, 2020, Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal as to Defendant Kia, which was entered by the Court on the same day. Accordingly, Defendant Kia’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant/Cross-Complainant Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. dba Kia of Cerritos’s Motion for Summary Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA KIA OF CERRITOS is a litigant

Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEB CRAIG A. ESQ.