This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 13:00:34 (UTC).

UNITED EL SEGUNDO INC. VS CHAD MAHALICK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 UNITED EL SEGUNDO INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHAD MAHALICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED EL SEGUNDO INC.

Defendants

THOMAS ZOE

MAHALICK CHAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

2/26/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Order (name extension) - Order PROPOSED

2/26/2021: Order (name extension) - Order PROPOSED

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/21/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE

2/4/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE

Complaint - Complaint

12/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/10/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/10/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by United El Segundo Inc. on 12/10/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order OF AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE: Filed By: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order PROPOSED: Filed By: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order OF AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE: Name Extension changed from STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE to OF AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE; As To Parties changed from Chad Mahalick (Defendant) to Chad Mahalick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order OF AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE: Result Date changed from 03/08/2021 to 02/26/2021; As To Parties changed from Chad Mahalick (Defendant) to Chad Mahalick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order of Stipulation of Agreement and Dismissal (CCP 664.6): Status Date changed from 02/04/2021 to 02/26/2021; Name Extension changed from PROPOSED to of Stipulation of Agreement and Dismissal (CCP 664.6); Result Date changed from 03/08/2021 to 02/26/2021; As To Parties changed from Chad Mahalick (Defendant) to Chad Mahalick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE; Filed by: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Mahalick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by United El Segundo Inc. on 12/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by United El Segundo Inc. as to Zoe Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Mahalick (Defendant); Service Date: 01/04/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Mahalick (Defendant); Zoe Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Mahalick (Defendant); Zoe Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: United El Segundo Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Mahalick (Defendant); Zoe Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED EL SEGUNDO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A