Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 08:29:48 (UTC).

UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3911

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC. DBA UNIVERSITY PARK HEALTHCARE CENTER

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

CRANE CHARA

Other Attorneys

COLLINS THOMAS A.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Attorney Change of Address and Phone

4/2/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Attorney Change of Address and Phone

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial Date

4/1/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial Date

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Petition and Set Trial Date

3/30/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Petition and Set Trial Date

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Complaint)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Complaint)

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

3/12/2021: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

General Denial - General Denial

1/14/2021: General Denial - General Denial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/24/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Complaint - Complaint

11/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/24/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAddress for Chara Crane (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Attorney Change of Address and Phone; Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Date; Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Petition and Set Trial Date; Signed and Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/30/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: State of California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: State of California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: State of California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: State of California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03911    Hearing Date: March 30, 2021    Dept: 26

United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. v. State of Cal. Dept. of Health, et al.

HEARING ON PETITION RE CITATION FOR VIOLATION OF THE LONG-TERM CARE, HEALTH, SAFETY AND SECURITY ACT OF 1973

(Cal. Health & Safety Code § 1428)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THE MATTER IS SET FOR TRIAL ON MAY 24, 2022 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On November 24, 2020, Plaintiff United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action challenging a citation issued by Defendant State of California Department of Health (“Defendant”) for Plaintiff’s violation of the Long Term Care, Health, Safety, and Security Action of 1973. The initial pleading is a Complaint to dismiss the citation and proposed assessment of civil penalties. Defendant filed its Answer on January 14, 2021 and Petitioner filed a Case Management Statement on March 12, 2021. The case was incorrectly designated “Other Civil Petition” and set for hearing with respect to the non-existent petition on March 30, 2021.

Accordingly, the court changes the designation of this case from “Other Civil Petition” to “Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex)” and takes the hearing on the non-existent petition off calendar. The matter is set for trial on May 24, 2022 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

Plaintiff to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC. DBA UNIVERSITY PARK HEALTHCARE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS THOMAS A.