Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2020 at 02:43:42 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, VS SHARIFA S CANDELARIA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHARIFA S CANDELARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4223

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

CANDELARIA SHARIFA S AKA SHARIFA CANDELARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRINH KATRINA

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Order To Show Cause

9/8/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Order To Show Cause

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/28/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/28/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Answer - Answer

6/30/2020: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/1/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

5/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/20/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Order To Show Cause; Filed by: As to: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from 07/01/2020 to 07/01/2020; Status changed from TP to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); TP by:

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/16/2020; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: SHARIFA S CANDELARIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less