Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2020 at 02:19:50 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, VS DAVID BORELLI

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID BORELLI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4220

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

BORELLI DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRINH KATRINA

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

7/9/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/20/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID BORELLI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID BORELLI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID BORELLI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID BORELLI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less