This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2020 at 02:23:39 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS ANSELMO MATA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANSELMO MATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0933

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MATA ANSELMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA GRACE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/19/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

11/19/2020: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

11/19/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE NOVEMBER 30, 2020 TRIAL DATE

11/24/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE NOVEMBER 30, 2020 TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.)

8/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 08/21/2020

8/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 08/21/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/30/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial date.)

6/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial date.)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial

4/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/2/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • Hearing02/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE NOVEMBER 30, 2020 TRIAL DATE: Filed By: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department G updated: Result Date to 11/25/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/23/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE NOVEMBER 30, 2020 TRIAL DATE; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANSELMO MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEx-Parte Proceedings scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEx-parte Reset - Court Unavailable, Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/25/2020 08:30 AM at Department G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Trial Brief; Filed by: ANSELMO MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANSELMO MATA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/01/2019; Service Cost: 84.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANSELMO MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANSELMO MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANSELMO MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19NWLC10933    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: A

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL: GRANTED

The Court Trial is advanced and continued to FEBRUARY 23, 2021 at 8:30 a.m., in Department A.

Moving party shall give notice.