This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2019 at 02:25:09 (UTC).

TYRA HARDEMAN VS BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 TYRA HARDEMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2363

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDEMAN TYRA

Pomona, CA 91767

Defendants

BLASCO REAL ESTATE INC. A CORPORATION

421 N Central Ave,

Upland, CA 91786

CHEEMA AMAN

Fresno, CA 93726

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

NOE LARRY GENE

STERBA JEANNE ANN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/29/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/29/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/14/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 06/07/2018

6/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 06/07/2018

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

6/7/2018: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Substitution of Attorney

6/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

5/17/2018: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Substitution of Attorney

5/17/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/29/2018

3/29/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/29/2018

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/25/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018

1/25/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/25/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/16/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/16/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/5/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 06/07/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 06/07/2018 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/07/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tyra Hardeman on 12/05/2017 as follows: Defendants Aman Cheema; BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC., A Corporation do not owe the plaintiff Tyra Hardeman any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tyra Hardeman on 12/05/2017, judgment entered on 03/29/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tyra Hardeman on 12/05/2017, judgment entered on 03/29/2018 as to BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC., A Corporation is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tyra Hardeman on 12/05/2017, judgment entered on 03/29/2018 as to Aman Cheema is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC., A Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tyra Hardeman (Plaintiff); As to: BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC., A Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 200.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Tyra Hardeman (Plaintiff); As to: Aman Cheema (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/16/2017; Service Cost: 200.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tyra Hardeman (Plaintiff); As to: BLASCO REAL ESTATE, INC., A Corporation (Defendant); Aman Cheema (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less